Age: 67
Gender: Male
Nationality: Malaysian
Tan Sri Dato’ Chang Ko Youn was appointed to the Board of Directors (“Board”) on 25 August 2015 as an Independent Non-Executive Chairman. He ceased as a Chairman of the Nomination Committee and a member of the Audit Committee and Remuneration Committee of the Company on 10 November 2021. He graduated with a Bachelor of Laws (Hons) from the University of Hull, England in 1981. In 1982, he was called to the English Bar as a Barrister-At-Law of Lincoln’s Inn, London and was subsequently called to the Malayan Bar in 1983.
Tan Sri Dato’ Chang Ko Youn began his career as a lawyer in Ipoh in 1983 until 1995 where he was attached to Chang Ko Youn & Co. In 1987, he was appointed as Councilor of the Kuala Kangsar District Council until 1995. Over the years, he has held numerous political positions in Parti Gerakan including Perak Gerakan Youth Chairman, Perak State Chairman, Chairman of its National Youth, National Deputy President and Acting President. In 1995, he was appointed as a Member of the Perak State Executive Council after winning the Jalong State Seat and held the post until 2008. In 2009, he was appointed as the Advisor of the Menteri Besar of Perak until 2013.
Since 2014, he has resumed his legal practice at Toh Theam Hock & Co in Ipoh, specialising in banking, commercial and conveyancing matters. He has been appointed as the Chairman of Yayasan Penjaja Dan Peniaga Kecil 1 Malaysia (YPPKM), a body handling micro-credit for petty traders sponsored by the Ministry of Finance. In 20 July 2022, he was appointed as the director for Perak Academy, a private funded organization that promote interest in the state of Perak by encouraging discussion, scholarship and research.
Tan Sri Dato’ Chang Ko Youn does not hold any shares in the Company or its subsidiaries, and has no family relationship with any director and/or major shareholder of the Company nor does he have any conflict of interest with the Company. He has not been convicted of any offences within the past five (5) years and has not been imposed any penalty by the relevant regulatory bodies during the financial year ended 31 December 2023 (“FYE 2023”). He does not hold any directorship in any other public listed companies.